MA S1628 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Accompanied H2456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Accompanied H2456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the establishment of first-time homebuyer savings accounts. Revenue.
Title
Authorizing the establishment of first-time homebuyer savings accounts
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Accompanied H2456 |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S26 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2456 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2456 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1628 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1628.pdf |