MA S819 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2527
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote savings for first time homebuyers. Housing.
Title
Promoting savings for first time homebuyers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2527 |
2019-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H2456 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2832 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4551
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S1628 (Similar To) 2020-02-28 - Accompanied H2456
S2527 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2832 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4551
S498 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Accompanied S520
S1628 (Similar To) 2020-02-28 - Accompanied H2456
S2527 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S819 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S819.pdf |