MA H2465 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the Department of Revenue to study revenue losses incurred by establishing income tax deductions in gaming facilities. Revenue.
Title
Relative to promoting the commonwealth tax incentive
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2456 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2479 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2491 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1725 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
H2598 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1615 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2479 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2491 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1725 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
H2598 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2512
S1928 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1615 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2465 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2465.pdf |