MA H2537 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5128
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create an income tax deduction for municipal and school fees. Revenue.
Title
To create an income tax deduction for municipal and school fees
Sponsors
Rep. David Linsky [D] | Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Colleen Garry [D] |
Rep. James Hawkins [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5128 |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2456 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2491 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2568 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2491 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2568 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H5128 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2537 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2537.pdf |