IL SB3548 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides for the re-designation of trauma centers to include Level III Trauma Centers and for designation of Acute Injury Stabilization Centers. Sets forth minimum standard requirements for trauma centers and Acute Injury Stabilization Centers. Makes conforming changes. Adds a representative from a pediatric critical care center to the members of the State Emergency Medical Services Advisory Council. Adds a burn care medical representative to the members of the State Trauma Advisory Council. Effective immediately.
Title
EMS-TRAUMA CENTER DESIGNATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2024-05-17 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |