NH HB1432 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 243; eff. 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 243; eff. 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting certain uses of deepfakes and creating a private claim of action.
Title
Relative to prohibiting certain uses of deepfakes and creating a private claim of action.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 243; eff. 01/01/2025 |
2024-07-02 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-31 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1871s and 2024-2123s (Rep. Lynn): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 21 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2024-1871s and 2024-2123s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2024-2123s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1871s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1871s, 05/22/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Special Order to next week, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove HB 1432-FN from the Consent Calendar; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1871s, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1100h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 9 |
2024-03-21 | House | Amendment # 2024-1100 (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 9 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1100h (NT) 03/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-27 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-02-06 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/15/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 20 |