CA AB2476 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10227.5 of, and to add Sections 10227.7 and 10277.6 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to childcare.
Title
Childcare services: alternative payment programs.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10227.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10227.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10277.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |