MA S2324 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on July 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a hate crimes grant program. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a hate crimes grant program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-27JointHearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-08-19HouseHouse concurred
2019-08-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education
2019-08-15SenateRules suspended
2019-07-25SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H4041 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3911 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S218 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:30 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4099 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S759 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S760 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H557 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4177 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2399 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback