MA H3911 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to representation of special education parent advisory councils on school committees. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure representation of Special Education Parent Advisory Councils on school committees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-26JointHearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-06-20SenateSenate concurred
2019-06-19HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Education
2019-05-08HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H521 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1094 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1821 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2247 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3248 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1222 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback