MA H510 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2348

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a task force (including members of the General Court) to review existing state mandates placed on public schools and districts. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an educational mandate task force

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2348
2019-05-21JointHearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H436 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3228 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Senate concurred
H1603 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H444 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H578 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2348 (Replaced by) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback