NH HB1653 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-21 - Executive Session: 10/17/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Hearing: Oct 17 @ 11:00 am in Legislative Office Building 306-308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-08-21 - Executive Session: 10/17/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Hearing: Oct 17 @ 11:00 am in Legislative Office Building 306-308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to determination of earnable compensation for certain group II retirement system members.
Title
Relative to determination of earnable compensation for certain group II retirement system members.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Pratt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-21 | House | Executive Session: 10/17/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-15 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 11 |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/07/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 6 P. 6 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/18/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2024 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 28 |