MA S16 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Lewis, a petition of Jason M. Lewis, Mike Connolly, Jack Patrick Lewis, Julian Cyr and other members of the General Court for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to provide resources for education and transportation through an additional tax on incomes in excess of one million dollars. Revenue.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to provide resources for education and transportation through an additional tax on incomes in excess of one million dollars
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-16 | Joint | No further action taken |
2020-12-16 | Joint | Joint session held and dissolved |
2020-05-13 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, December 16, 2020 |
2019-11-13 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, May 13, 2020 |
2019-06-12 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, November 13, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, June 12, 2019 |
2019-05-06 | Joint | Called for consideration in the joint session |
2019-04-25 | House | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported favorably by committee and placed on file |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported favorably by committee and placed on file |
2019-03-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Petition filed |
Same As/Similar To
H86 (Similar To) 2019-06-12 - Amendment agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #73 and House Roll Call 77
H2456 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2506 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2397 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2491 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1777 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2441 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1615 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2456 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2506 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2397 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H2541 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2491 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1777 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2441 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1615 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S16 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S16.pdf |