FL S2502 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Incorporating by reference certain calculations of the Florida Education Finance Program; providing that funds for instructional materials must be released and expended as required in specified proviso language; deleting a provision providing for the carrying forward of undisbursed funds allocated for the Schools of Hope Revolving Loan Program; creating the Community School Grant Program within the Department of Education, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing the 2019-2020 General Appropriations Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-03SenateRetained on Calendar
2019-04-02SenateIntroduced
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/19
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-03-28SenateFiled
2019-03-27SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2019-03-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/28/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2019-03-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/27/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-22SenateSubmitted for consideration by Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

H5001 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2500
S2500 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations: Bradley (Chair), Benacquisto (At Large), Braynon (At Large), Flores (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Montford (At Large), Rodriguez (At Large), Simmons (At Large), Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Mayfield (Chair), Albritton, Bean, Benacquisto (At Large), Berman, Braynon (At Large), Broxson, Flores (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Hooper, Hutson, Montford (At Large), Powell, Rodriguez, Simmons (At Large), Simpson (At Large), Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/Government Operations and Technology: Mayfield (Chair), Albritton, Bean, Benacquisto (At Large), Berman, Braynon (At Large), Broxson, Flores (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Hooper, Hutson, Montford (At Large), Powell, Rodriguez, Simmons (At Large), Simpson (At Large), Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Brandes (Chair), Benacquisto (At Large), Bracy, Braynon (At Large), Flores (At Large), Gainer, Gibson (At Large), Gruters, Harrell, Montford (At Large), Perry, Rodriguez (At Large), Rouson, Simmons (At Large), Simpson (At Large), Taddeo, Wright; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Higher Education: Stargel (Chair), Baxley, Benacquisto (At Large), Book, Braynon (At Large), Diaz, Flores, Gibson (At Large), Montford, Pizzo, Rodriguez (At Large), Simmons, Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/PreK-12: Stargel (Chair), Baxley, Benacquisto (At Large), Book, Braynon (At Large), Diaz, Flores, Gibson (At Large), Montford, Pizzo, Rodriguez (At Large), Simmons, Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Bean (Chair), Benacquisto (At Large), Book, Braynon (At Large), Cruz, Diaz, Farmer, Flores, Gibson (At Large), Harrell, Hooper, Montford (At Large), Passidomo, Rader, Rodriguez (At Large), Rouson, Simmons (At Large), Simpson (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Tourism: Hutson (Chair), Benacquisto (At Large), Brandes, Braynon (At Large), Flores (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Lee, Montford (At Large), Perry, Rodriguez (At Large), Simmons (At Large), Simpson, Taddeo, Thurston, Torres;
H839 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
H5003 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Temporarily postponed on 3rd reading; On Unfinished Business
H5101 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
H5201 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
H5301 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Received
H5303 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Ordered enrolled
S190 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
S1570 (Similar To) 2019-04-19 - Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
S7070 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
S1296 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - CS by Education read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002333Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100364Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100628Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100642Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101362Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
110123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11224Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2069935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216177Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216262Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21823Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255249Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2740Amended CodeSee Bill Text
275304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2835Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2820041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2820051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29637Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381988Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4092567Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4099113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4099119Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4200005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209079Amended CodeSee Bill Text
430205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817568Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985686Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9856865Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback