FL H5301 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers powers, duties, functions, records, offices, personnel, pending issues & contracts, administrative authority, administrative rules, & funds from AST to DMS by a type two transfer; establishes Division of State Technology within DMS; specifies reporting requirements for executive branch agencies & judicial branch through statewide travel management system; requires each state agency to adopt formal procedures for cloud-computing options; creates Florida Cybersecurity Task Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Information Technology Reorganization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#41 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-03SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 883
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for SB 1570
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateReceived
2019-04-05SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateIn Messages
2019-04-04HouseImmediately certified
2019-04-04HousePassed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2019-04-04HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-03HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/19
2019-03-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-27HouseFavorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0
2019-03-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/27/19, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-20HouseIntroduced
2019-03-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1570 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5301
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 2500
S2500 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
170315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21596Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2820041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2820051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28200515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2870591Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365173Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
66850Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
970525Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback