IL SB3756 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Provides that the Department of the Lottery's rules shall allow a consumer to redeem all sums of winnings and to withdraw unspent money deposited in the consumer's internet lottery account in the same manner in which it was deposited.
Title
LOTTERY ACCOUNT-WITHDRAWAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Gaming, Wagering, and Racing |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 7.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3756&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3756.htm |