FL S1650 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Children and Families to establish a direct-support organization to assist the Children and Youth Cabinet with carrying out certain purposes and responsibilities; requiring that the order for placement of a child in shelter care contain a written finding specifying that the Department of Children and Families has placement and care responsibility for certain children; requiring information to be provided to relatives and nonrelatives regarding the Guardianship Assistance Program and the Relative Caregiver Program; revising when a court must return a child to the custody of his or her parents after making certain determinations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted CS/HB 7099
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-18SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-10SenateCS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2019-04-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-08SenateCS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-04-02SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2019-03-27SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2019-03-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-25SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7099 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-142, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
H179 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142)
S128 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142)
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-116, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39523Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091451Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627746Amended CodeSee Bill Text
934255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
960065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback