FL H7099 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-142, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the central abuse hotline to accept certain reports or calls for investigation for children who do not live in this state; requiring certain judicial orders to specify that the Department of Children and Families has placement and care responsibility for certain children; authorizing psychiatric nurses to prescribe psychotropic medications to certain children; requiring a young adult in extended foster care to provide certain documentation or execute a consent for release of certain records; revising the determinations a court must make to return a child to the custody of his or her parents; revising membership of the Children and Youth Cabinet; revising eligibility for Medicaid coverage for children eligible for the Guardianship Assistance Program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#348 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#216 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26 Chapter No. 2019-142, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
2019-06-25 Approved by Governor
2019-06-25 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-01HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-05-01HouseConcurred in 2 amendment(s) (765116, 796068) 1124
2019-04-30HouseIn returning messages
2019-04-30SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-29SenateAmendment(s) adopted (765116, 796068)
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1650
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-12HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-11HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-04-02HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-04-02HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-29HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-25HouseIntroduced
2019-03-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1650 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
H179 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142)
S128 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142)
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-116, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100925Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40257Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091451Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414045Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7099
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7099/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7099/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7099/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7099/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7099/Amendment/059975/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7099/Amendment/796068/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7099/Amendment/765116/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7099/Amendment/256242/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7099/Vote/HouseVote_h07099c1216.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7099/Vote/SenateVote_h07099c1019.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7099/Vote/HouseVote_h07099c1348.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback