FL S1646 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to consider the use of a fumigant as a pesticide for raw agricultural commodities; revising the membership of the Florida Food Safety and Food Defense Advisory Council; revising the authority of the department to conduct onsite inspections of facilities used to produce and process milk and milk products and to collect samples of such for testing; authorizing a contract for the sale of a horse to include a covenant for the continuing care of the horse, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-10SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-02SenateCS by Agriculture read 1st time
2019-03-27SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-03-27SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-25SenateCS by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1215 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S1738 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-05-04 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
487021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4870435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
500033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
500121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
500147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
502012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
502014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
502053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
502181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
570441Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57093Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
595404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
828261Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback