FL S1296 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Governors to require state universities to conduct an annual assessment related to intellectual freedom and viewpoint diversity at each state university; revising the standards for the preeminent state research universities program; revising the state university system performance-based incentives, etc.
Title
Organization and Operation of State Universities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-03 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H839 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59), CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S194 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)
S1744 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)
H1407 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
H7071 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-119
H5501 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
S190 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-103, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-116, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
S770 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S194 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)
S1744 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)
H1407 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
H7071 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-119
H5501 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
S190 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-103, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-116, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
S770 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 7065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |