FL H7071 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to preapprenticeship & apprenticeship programs, secondary & postsecondary workforce education, high school graduation requirements, & postsecondary education provisions, & school grades; creates SAIL to 60 Initiative; renames Higher Education Coordinating Council as Florida Talent Development Council & revises councils membership & duties; & creates FLAG program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workforce Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#359 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#242 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24 Chapter No. 2019-119
2019-06-24 Approved by Governor
2019-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-02HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-02HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2019-05-02HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (884156) 1153
2019-05-02HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-02SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenateAmendment(s) adopted (884156)
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 770
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Education; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Education; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 108 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time 872
2019-04-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseAmendment(s) adopted (073353, 100997, 178157, 449795, 565827, 855583) 835
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-05HouseCS by Education Committee read 1st time
2019-04-05HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-03HouseCS by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-01HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-14HouseReferred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced
2019-03-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H367 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
H839 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59), CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
H1407 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
H7055 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S522 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S1296 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S770 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S1366 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S1462 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S1588 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S190 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-103, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
H73 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
H661 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S114 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10023105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034156Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003491Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10046495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100622Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10072616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100837Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100844Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100921Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1011802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101257Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446092Amended CodeSee Bill Text
455213Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/Amendment/449795/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/Amendment/565827/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/Amendment/100997/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/Amendment/855583/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/Amendment/073353/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/Amendment/458765/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/Amendment/178157/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/Vote/HouseVote_h07071e1242.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/Vote/SenateVote_h07071e1002.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7071/Vote/HouseVote_h07071e1359.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback