FL S1588 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Florida Pathways to Career Opportunities Grant Program within the Department of Education; requiring the Commissioner of Education to establish an application process for the program; authorizing school districts, charter schools, and Florida College System institutions to apply for grants under the program; authorizing students who earn one credit in a computer science course to substitute the credit for one science credit to fulfill standard high school diploma requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhancing Florida's Workforce

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7055 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
S770 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7071
H7071 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009551Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback