FL H7055 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions related to career education & district school board duties, high school graduation requirements & diploma designations, school grade calculations, career center requirements, & CAPE Industry Certification Funding List; requires certain students to take career education planning course for promotion to high school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseCS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/16/19, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-03-26HouseCS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-26HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-25HouseCS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced
2019-03-07HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1366 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
S1588 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Introduced
H7071 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
S770 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034156Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003492Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10072616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1007271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100844Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446052Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback