FL S0522 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Education to provide a specified annual report to the Legislature and the State Apprenticeship Advisory Council; requiring the department to develop and manage the Florida Apprenticeship Grant Program, subject to appropriation of funds by the Legislature; authorizing certain registered apprenticeship program sponsors to apply for grant awards to help fund apprenticeship programs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Apprenticeship Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-12SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-01-24SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H367 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H7071 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S770 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7071

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
446011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
446051Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback