FL S1308 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Commissioner of Education to conduct an annual review of career and technical education offerings in the K-12 education system, career centers, and the Florida College System; requiring the statewide articulation agreement to provide for a reverse transfer agreement; authorizing state universities or Florida College System institutions to waive tuition and fees for students who meet specified requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pathways to College and Career Success

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-26SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2019-03-25SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-19SenateCS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H839 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table -- Companion bill SB 190 passed
S1296 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
H1407 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
H7071 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S770 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7071
S190 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100926Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback