FL H0839 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59), CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to FCSI employees & officers, BOG, SBE, OIG duties, preeminent state research universities program, SUS performance-based incentives, text books & instructional materials, transfer of funds by university board of trustees, J. Hillis Miller Health Center, specified pilot project, budget requests, & statewide articulation agreement; & requires Commissioner of Education to provide recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#248 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59), CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
2019-04-29HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2019-04-26HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2019-04-25HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-25HouseAmendment(s) adopted (501159)
2019-04-25HouseAmendment(s) failed (041643, 131141) 876
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-17HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2019-04-11HouseCS/CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-11HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS/CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-29HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-03-28HouseCS/CS by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-28HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS/CS by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-15HouseNow in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-14HouseCS by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-14HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-13HouseCS by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5
2019-03-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-02-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1296 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S194 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)
S1744 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)
H1407 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
H7071 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-119
S190 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-103, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
H5501 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-116, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
S770 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
H371 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59)
H741 (Similar To) 2019-05-31 - Chapter No. 2019-59
S1272 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10017065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100428Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004346Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100441Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100727Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100924Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101190Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215985Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/Amendment/684007/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/Amendment/771327/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/Amendment/245707/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/Amendment/356133/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/Amendment/501159/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/Amendment/041643/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/Amendment/131141/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/Amendment/283327/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/839/Vote/HouseVote_h00839c3248.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback