FL H0371 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination in K-20 public education system based on religion; requires public K-20 educational institution to take into consideration anti-Semitism under certain instances of discrimination; defines "anti-Semitism."
Title
Discrimination In Florida K-20 Public Education System
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Caruso [R] | Rep. Randy Fine [R] | Rep. Michael Grieco [D] | Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Education Committee |
2019-01-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H741 (Similar To) 2019-05-31 - Chapter No. 2019-59
S1272 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59)
H839 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59), CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S1272 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59)
H839 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59), CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/371 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/371/BillText/Filed/PDF |