FL S1272 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting discrimination in the Florida K-20 public education system based on religion; requiring public K-20 educational institutions to take into consideration anti-Semitism under certain instances of discrimination; defining the term "anti-Semitism", etc.
Title
Anti-Semitism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 741 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education; Rules |
2019-04-10 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Now in Education |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Education; Rules |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H741 (Similar To) 2019-05-31 - Chapter No. 2019-59
H371 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59)
H839 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59), CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
H371 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59)
H839 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59), CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |