FL S0190 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-103, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Auditor General to verify the accuracy of unexpended amounts in specified funds certified by university and Florida College System institution chief financial officers; requiring the Board of Governors to develop and annually deliver a training program for members of state university boards of trustees; prohibiting a Florida College System institution direct-support organization from giving, directly or indirectly, any gift to a political committee; requiring, by a specified academic year, Florida College System institutions and state universities to execute agreements to establish "2+2" targeted pathway programs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#385 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#300 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18 Chapter No. 2019-103, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
2019-06-18 Approved by Governor
2019-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 0
2019-05-03HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) to House amendment(s) (285804) 1311
2019-05-03HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) as amended (439287)
2019-05-03SenateAmendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (285804)
2019-05-03SenateIn returning messages
2019-05-03HouseReturned
2019-05-03SenateRequested House to return
2019-05-02HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-02SenateRequested House to recede
2019-05-02SenateRefused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (439287)
2019-04-30SenateIn returning messages
2019-04-30HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time 1029
2019-04-29HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-29HouseAmendment(s) adopted (439287) 965
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time 963
2019-04-26HouseReceived
2019-04-26HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-25HouseIn Messages
2019-04-25SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 35 NAYS 2
2019-04-25SenateAmendment(s) adopted (299628, 539338, 563590)
2019-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24SenateOrdered engrossed
2019-04-24SenateAmendment(s) adopted (392352, 502992, 561776, 605696) 428, 429
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-22SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-22SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-18SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-20SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 03/20/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-06SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/06/19, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H839 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 741 (Ch. 2019-59), CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
H5101 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
H5501 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-116, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
S1296 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
H1407 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
H7051 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)
H7071 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-119
S194 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)
S770 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
S1744 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1004335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1008322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009286Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100953Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009531Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009536Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1011802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101184Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101340Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101360Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101364Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1013841Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215985Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216136Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/BillText/e3/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Amendment/107176/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Amendment/279256/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Amendment/906626/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Amendment/719102/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Amendment/852610/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Amendment/392352/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Amendment/561776/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Amendment/415858/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Amendment/846106/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Amendment/502992/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Amendment/100856/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Amendment/605696/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Vote/SenateVote_s00190e1007.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Vote/HouseVote_s00190e2300.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Vote/SenateVote_s00190e2035.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/190/Vote/HouseVote_s00190e2385.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback