FL S0194 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Office of the Inspector General of the Board of Governors to verify certain information for accuracy; requiring, by a specified academic year, Florida College System institutions and state universities to execute agreements to establish "2+2" targeted pathway programs; requiring district school boards to notify students about credit-by-examination and dual enrollment equivalency lists, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-16SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-20SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-19SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H839 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table -- Companion bill SB 190 passed
S1296 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S190 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1001706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100723Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100727Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback