FL H7051 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to BOG responsibilities, IOG investigations, state university DSOs, Florida College System institution board of trustees, Florida College System institution DSOs, Commissioner of Education & Chancellor of State University System duties; & revises certain capital outlay provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#89 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Education; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-04-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-01HouseCS by Education Committee read 1st time
2019-03-29HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-28HouseCS by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/28/19, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
2019-03-22HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-03-21HouseFavorable by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 03/21/19, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; Education Committee
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1744 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
H5501 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
S190 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-103

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1001706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100428Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1008322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1011012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101330Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101361Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback