FL H0661 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that certain students are eligible for alternative pathway to standard high school diploma through Career & Technical Education (CTE) pathway option; provides requirements for CTE pathway option; requires that each principal or his or her designee inform parents & students of CTE pathway option & establish certain processes relating to pathway; requires district school boards to incorporate certain information in student progression plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative High School Graduation Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-13HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-02-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S770 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7071 (Ch. 2019-119)
H7071 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-119

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback