CA AB2883 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 972, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 972, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 89005.7 of, and to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 92689) to Chapter 6 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
California State University: University of California: Lunar New Year holiday.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB2883 Low By Durazo (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2883 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2883 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 972, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5379.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 89005.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 92689 | New Code | See Bill Text |