CA SB1266 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 108940 and 108941 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 12 (commencing with Section 108940) of Part 3 of Division 104 of, and to add Section 108942 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to product safety.
Title
Product safety: bisphenol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | April 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3467.) (April 3). |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HEALTH. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 108940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 108941 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 108942 | New Code | See Bill Text |