CA SB1186 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 206, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 206, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3002 and 3022 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to fairs.
Title
Fairs: free admissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-15 - Assembly - SB 1186 Ochoa Bogh Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1186 Ochoa Bogh (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - [04-02-2024] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1186 Ochoa Bogh (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - [04-02-2024] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 206, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2024-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6320.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7). |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3672.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3444.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | April 2 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 3002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 3022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |