OH HB466 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-24 - Effective
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-24 - Effective
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4735.55, 4735.56, and 4735.59 of the Revised Code to require a written agency agreement for a licensed broker to represent a buyer or seller in a real estate transaction.
Title
Requires written real estate agency agreement for representation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-24 | Effective | |
2024-07-24 | Signed By The Governor | |
2024-07-15 | Sent To The Governor | |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Passed |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Select Committee on Housing |
2024-06-26 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Referred to committee: Select Committee on Housing |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-05-08 | House | Passed |
2024-05-01 | House | Reported - Amended: Civil Justice |
2024-04-02 | House | Referred to committee: Civil Justice |
2024-03-27 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Commerce
House Civil Justice Committee
Housing and Real Property
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Senate Select Committee on Housing
House Civil Justice Committee
Housing and Real Property
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Senate Select Committee on Housing
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 35 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 35 | 56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 35 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |