FL H0073 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6-1)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to acceleration mechanisms for meeting course requirements, NGSSS relating to financial literacy, & high school graduation requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High School Graduation Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-27HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-26HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HousePCS on Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-03HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2018-12-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S114 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - CS by Rules read 1st time
S416 (Similar To) 2019-03-05 - Introduced
S770 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10023105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003436Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback