CA SB1064 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 875, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 26001, 26050, 26051, 26051.5, 26061, and 26070 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 26070) of Division 10 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: operator and separate premises license types: excessive concentration of licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1064 Laird Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1064 Laird Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1064 Laird (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 875, Statutes of 2024.
2024-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2024-09-03 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2024-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 5604.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2024-08-26SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2024-08-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6553.) Ordered to the Senate.
2024-08-22AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-08-22AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2024-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-19AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2024-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2024-08-07AssemblyAugust 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2024-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-06-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2024-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2024-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4143.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2024-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-05-16SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2024-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3970.) (May 16).
2024-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2024-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2024-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2024-04-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3698.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-04-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
2024-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2024-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D.
2024-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2024-02-21SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2024-02-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
2024-02-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26001New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code26050New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code26051New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code26051.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code26061Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code26070New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1064
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1064#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1064#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1064#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1064#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1064#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1064#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1064#93ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1064#92CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB1064

Bill Comments

feedback