IL HB4954 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Reinserts language that provides that the 4 State mine rescue stations must be certified by the Mine Safety and Health Administration of the U.S. Department of Labor. Removes language providing that no person performing mine rescue services for a State mine rescue station and no operator of a mine whose employee participates as a member of a State mine rescue operation is liable in any civil action that arises under the laws of this State for damage or injury. Removes language providing that a person performing mine rescue services for a State mine rescue station may be liable if the member acted with malicious purpose, in bad faith, or in a wanton or reckless manner.
Title
COAL MINING-RESCUE OPERATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Energy & Environment Committee; 028-000-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 025-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregg Johnson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 705 | 1.26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 705 | 1.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 705 | 1.28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 705 | 1.29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 705 | 1.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 705 | 1.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 705 | 11.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 11.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 11.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 11.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 11.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 705 | 11.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |