NJ A4571 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (74-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (74-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to powers and duties of NJ Infrastructure Bank.
Title
Makes various changes to powers and duties of NJ Infrastructure Bank.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-1-0) |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3472 (Same As) 2024-06-26 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading