FL H5003 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Implements specified appropriations of the General Appropriations Act for 2019-2020 fiscal year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing the 2019-2020 General Appropriations Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
2019-04-24HouseSubstituted SB 2502
2019-04-04HouseTemporarily postponed on 3rd reading; On Unfinished Business
2019-04-04HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-03HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-03HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/19
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H5001 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
H5201 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
H7087 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
S2500 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-115, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-116, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
112061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11224Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216262Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
275304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2880655Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29637Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4099113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4099119Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4200005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209079Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817568Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback