FL S7070 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter No. 2019-23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the programs through which certain parents may seek private educational choice options; providing that charters may include a provision for charter schools to be held responsible for all costs incurred by the district in connection with complaints to the Office of Civil Rights or the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission; establishing the Family Empowerment Scholarship Program; revising eligibility requirements under the Florida Tax Credit Scholarship Program for certain students; creating the Florida Best and Brightest Teacher and Principal Allocation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#304 (Y: 76 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#284 (Y: 43 N: 71 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#283 (Y: 43 N: 72 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#282 (Y: 43 N: 70 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#281 (Y: 47 N: 67 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Chapter No. 2019-23
2019-05-09 Approved by Governor
2019-05-06 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-30SenateOrdered enrolled
2019-04-30HouseCS passed; YEAS 76 NAYS 39
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time 1031
2019-04-29HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-29HouseAmendment(s) failed (005869, 012915, 024287, 096861, 109029, 204293, 222837, 232529, 233913, 406063, 457171, 477135, 482359, 484127, 583341, 604309, 607961, 608895, 622223, 726247, 789057, 803331, 839717, 858871) 985
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time 967
2019-04-26HouseReceived 944
2019-04-26HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-25HouseIn Messages
2019-04-25SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 17
2019-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-25SenateAmendment(s) adopted (208314, 216008, 766430, 785318)
2019-04-24SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2019-04-24SenateTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2019-04-24SenateAmendment(s) failed (103012, 359668, 821510, 939266) 435, 437
2019-04-24SenateAmendment(s) adopted (106322, 540300, 581122, 581332, 726188, 881674) 435, 436
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time 471
2019-04-23SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-22SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-18SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 8
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-21SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-19SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2019-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 03/19/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-03-06SenateFiled
2019-03-06SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2019-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/06/19, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-01SenateSubmitted for consideration by Education

Same As/Similar To

H889 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education Committee
S294 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
S1410 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
S1576 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
H7075 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table -- Companion bill SB 7070 passed
H7095 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H5101 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-116
H6071 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
H7061 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
S1506 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
S1740 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002333Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002394Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100240Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100364Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100485Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101259Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1013385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101364Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212099Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2121832Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/446562/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/746886/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/600506/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/281020/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/540300/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/359668/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/726188/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/560126/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/279626/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/581122/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/113230/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/881674/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/939266/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/821510/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/103012/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/581332/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/216008/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/241246/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/106322/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/612902/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/785318/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/766430/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/208314/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/591914/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/583556/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/808010/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Amendment/439008/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Vote/SenateVote_s07070c1003.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Vote/SenateVote_s07070c1002.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Vote/HouseVote_s07070e1281.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Vote/HouseVote_s07070e1282.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Vote/HouseVote_s07070e1283.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Vote/HouseVote_s07070e1284.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7070/Vote/HouseVote_s07070e1304.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback