FL H7095 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to controlled open enrollment, state school choice scholarship program accountability and oversight, charter schools, schools of hope, & The Hope Scholarship Program; authorizes Center for Community Schools to award grants for purposes related to community schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Choice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-12HouseCS by Education Committee read 1st time
2019-04-12HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-04-03HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-04-01HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 1
2019-03-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/01/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-22HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced
2019-03-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1197 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
S1410 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
S1470 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S1668 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
S7070 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Chapter No. 2019-23

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002333Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100240Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10046499Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7095
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7095/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7095/BillText/c1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7095/Amendment/684035/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7095/Amendment/211845/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7095/Amendment/798555/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7095/Amendment/250853/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7095/Amendment/247147/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7095/Amendment/603507/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7095/Amendment/124841/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7095/Amendment/952689/PDF

Bill Comments

feedback