FL H7061 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to teacher preparation programs, educator preparation institutes, DOE duties relating to teacher recruitment & retention, supports for first-time teachers, & educator certification requirements relating to mastery of general knowledge requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher Preparation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-03HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2019-03-26HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-03-25HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-08HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1576 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
S7070 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Chapter No. 2019-23

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100485Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101259Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101298Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback