MI HB4062 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Transmitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Civil rights: housing discrimination; housing discrimination based on source of income; prohibit. Amends title of 1972 PA 348 (MCL 554.601 - 554.616) & adds sec. 1c. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0205'23, SB 0206'23

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil rights: housing discrimination; housing discrimination based on source of income; prohibit. Amends title of 1972 PA 348 (MCL 554.601 - 554.616) & adds sec. 1c. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0205'23, SB 0206'23

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-27HouseTransmitted
2024-06-27HouseTitle Amended
2024-06-27HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 261 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2024-06-27HouseRead A Third Time
2024-06-26HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-06-26HouseSubstitute (h-4) Adopted
2024-06-26HouseRead A Second Time
2024-05-15HouseReferred To Second Reading
2024-05-15HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-4)
2023-02-02HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/01/2023
2023-02-01HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2023-02-01HouseRead A First Time
2023-02-01HouseIntroduced By Representative Jennifer Conlin

Same As/Similar To

SB0205 (Same As) 2024-06-27 - Returned To Senate
SB0206 (Same As) 2024-06-27 - Returned To Senate

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback