FL H7075 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Family Empowerment Scholarship Program; revises provisions relating to Florida Tax Credit Scholarship Program, Hope Scholarship Program, & certain contributions to such programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Choice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
2019-04-03HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/19
2019-03-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-27HouseFavorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 9
2019-03-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/27/19, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-18HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-15HouseIntroduced
2019-03-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1410 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
S7070 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Chapter No. 2019-23
H5101 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
S2500 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-115, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002394Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100240Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212099Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/BillText/Filed/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/215519/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/015347/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/385849/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/468441/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/221273/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/530167/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/969853/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/050653/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/597977/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/312683/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/822693/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/171217/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/566035/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/328699/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/086189/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/964685/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/325669/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/448753/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/745621/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/312807/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/854155/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/164605/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/893067/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/142567/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/069323/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/352391/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/276235/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/794311/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/377273/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/596879/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/652407/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/982751/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/526279/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/653085/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/647441/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/633317/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/697137/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/859101/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/509741/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/178051/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/459251/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/967843/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/013109/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/330497/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/025539/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/761945/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/718135/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/833527/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/802679/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/922177/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/365243/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/750493/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/146121/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/852603/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/367075/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/803823/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7075/Amendment/457629/PDF

Bill Comments

feedback