FL H5201 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises dates requiring APD, in conjunction with AHCA, to develop & submit plan to redesign specified Medicaid waiver program under certain conditions; requires AHCA to make payments for Medicaid-covered services retroactive for certain eligible persons; authorizes AHCA to receive funds from certain entities to make Low Income Pool Program payments; revises dates relating to certain data used to calculate disproportionate share payment; requires insurer or provider of health care services under Florida Healthy Kids Corporation contract to refund amount to be deposited into specified fund under certain conditions.
Title
Medicaid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-03 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/19 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 7 |
2019-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/27/19, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
H5003 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S2500 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-115, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-116, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
H5003 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S2500 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-115, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), HB 5303 (Ch. 2019-161), HB 5401 (Ch. 2019-141), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116), SB 2504 (Ch. 2019-117), SB 7016 (Ch. 2019-8)
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-06-24 - Chapter No. 2019-116, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5301 (Ch. 2019-118), CS/HB 7099 (Ch. 2019-142), CS/SB 190 (Ch. 2019-103), SB 2500 (Ch. 2019-115)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
393 | 0661 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |