FL H6031 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Abrogates scheduled repeal of provisions related to Florida Tourism Industry Marketing Corporation direct-support organization & Division of Tourism Marketing of Enterprise Florida, Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Tourism Marketing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S178 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
S2502 (Similar To) 2019-05-04 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2881226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
288923Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback