MA S786 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2313

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to obtaining relief from abuse and harassment. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to obtaining relief from abuse and harassment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2313
2017-07-10JointHearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S582 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2403
S64 (Similar To) 2017-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2213
S275 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S353 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S302 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1082 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1085 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2508
S1632 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1568 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied H3337
H345 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H339 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4494
H1638 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2393 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
S2061 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Placed on file
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3904 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H2267 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4311 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - H4291, published as amended
S2619 (Similar To) 2018-10-15 - New draft substituted, see S2670
H4852 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2670 (Similar To) 2018-10-15 - Read third and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback