MA S2619 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2532
Note: Legislation replaced by S2670
Note: Legislation replaced by S2670
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-15 - New draft substituted, see S2670
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-15 - New draft substituted, see S2670
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create senior tax relief in the Town of Carver,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2619).
Title
Creating senior tax relief in the town of Carver
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-15 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2670 |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Read second |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed on the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-07-19 | Senate | New draft of S2532 |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2532 (Replaces) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2619
H1638 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1631 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1632 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3336 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1598 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S2670 (Replaced by) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
H1638 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1631 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1632 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3336 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1598 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S2670 (Replaced by) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2619 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2619.pdf |