MA H1638 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide property tax relief for certain caregivers providing assistance for spouses or dependents. Revenue.
Title
Providing property tax relief for certain caregivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1398 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H336 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - House concurred
H2649 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1643 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3911
H2580 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H336 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - House concurred
H2649 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1643 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3911
H2580 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1638 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1638.pdf |